EP1247667 - Air flow damper [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/51] |
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komowski, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Schemppstrasse 102 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Grauel, Andreas, Dr. BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property, G-IP, Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005099.3 | 07.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | DE2001118497 | 06.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10118497 | [2002/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1247667 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1247667 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1247667 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
B60H1/00678 (EP);
B60H2001/00721 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Strömungsklappe | [2002/41] | English: | Air flow damper | [2002/41] | French: | Clapet d'écoulement d'air | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 08.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 28.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IE | 29.07.2009 | IT | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | AT | 07.03.2010 | GB | 07.03.2010 | LU | 07.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
AT | 07.03.2010 | ||
GB | 07.03.2010 | ||
LU | 07.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
AT | 07.03.2010 | ||
GB | 07.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
AT | 07.03.2010 | ||
GB | 07.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
GB | 07.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/46] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IE | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | FI | 29.07.2009 | |
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | SE | 29.07.2009 | |
ES | 09.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3510991 (SUEDDEUTSCHE KUEHLER BEHR [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6-9 * page 7, line 20 - page 10, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3826182 (ADAM OPEL AG) [A] 1,3,5,6,8,9* column 2, line 35 - column 3, line 36; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19734145 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 23; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | EP0732231 |