EP1347122 - Packer and method for inserting this packer in a construction element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states high-Chem GmbH Solalindenstrasse 58 81827 München / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2003/39] | Representative(s) | Szynka, Dirk, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zielstattstraße 38 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/39] | Szynka, Dirk, et al König-Szynka-von Renesse Patentanwälte Sollner Strasse 9 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005199.1 | 08.03.2002 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1347122 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1347122 | Date: | 20.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/02 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
E04G23/0203 (EP);
E04G23/0211 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, LI [2004/27] |
Former [2004/25] | |||
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Packer und Verfahren zum Einbringen des Packers in ein Gebäudeteil | [2003/39] | English: | Packer and method for inserting this packer in a construction element | [2003/39] | French: | Dispositif d'injection sous pression et méthode d'insertion de ce dispositif dans un élément de construction | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/39] | 12.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Divisional application(s) | EP02024021.4 / EP1342866 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   03.05.2004 | 03.05.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   03.05.2004 | 03.05.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   03.05.2004 | 03.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   03.05.2004 | 03.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   03.05.2004 | 03.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2606060 (WOLF PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1,6 * page 2, line 20 - line 21 * * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 15 ** figures 1C,4A,4B *; | [X]US4905430 (SCHMIDT ARNO P O [DE]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 11 * * column 4, line 11 - line 66 * * figure - *; | [X]DE19635828 (SCHREINER KLAUS [DE]) [X] 1,4-6,8,10,12-14 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 13 * * figure - * | Examination | DE2752461 | JPS6425000 | JPH03241115 | JP2000345789 | US2002039538 |