EP1240946 - Impact mill with pivotable impact apron [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAZEMAG & EPR GmbH Brokweg 75 48249 Dülmen / DE | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heukamp, Volker Martin-Luther-Strasse 12 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2002/38] | Application number, filing date | 02005480.5 | 09.03.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | DE2001112959 | 17.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112959 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1240946 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1240946 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | [2003/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B02C13/09 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
B02C13/095 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Prallmühle mit verschwenkbarem Prallwerk | [2002/38] | English: | Impact mill with pivotable impact apron | [2002/38] | French: | Broyeur à impact avec écran d' impact orientable | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 03.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/14] | 07.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.05.2004 | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1496213 (FRICKEY EDWARD H) [X] 1 * Gesamt-Dokument;; figures 1-4 * [A] 3,4; | [XY]US3128953 (F.WAGENEDER) [X] 1,3,5 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 3; figures 1,2; claims 1-4 * [Y] 2; | [A]US3850375 (FORD F) [A] 1-4 * column 5, line 23 - column 5, line 38; figures 2,3 *; | [A]US4047673 (AULMANN HERBERT, et al) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 51; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4049206 (KONIG ROLF, et al) [X] 1,3,4 * column 2, line 9 - column 5, line 47; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4449673 (CAMERON WALLACE C [US]) [A] 1-4* column 2, line 59 - column 6, line 12; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US5503340 (DOPPSTADT WERNER [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 4, line 25 - column 5, line 20; figures 1,2,4 *; | [YA]US6059210 (SMITH LEWARD N [US]) [Y] 2 * column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 53; figure 2 * [A] 1,3,4 | by applicant | DE1607456 | DE3911086 | DE4312509 |