EP1211436 - Automatic transmission for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.11.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | For all designated states AISIN AW CO., LTD. 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taniguchi, Takao c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | 02 /
Tsukamoto, Kazumasa c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | 03 /
Hayabuchi, Masahiro c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | 04 /
Nishida, Masaaki c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1192 / JP | 05 /
Kasuya, Satoru c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1193 / JP | 06 /
Kato, Akitoshi c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1194 / JP | 07 /
Kato, Hiroshi c/o AISIN AW CO., LTD., 10, Takane, Fujii-cho Anjo-shi, Aichi-ken 444-1195 / JP | [2002/23] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/23] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005548.9 | 04.06.1999 | [2002/23] | Priority number, date | JP19980173899 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: JP 17389998 | JP19980262313 | 01.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26231398 | JP19980353907 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: JP 35390798 | JP19990094401 | 31.03.1999 Original published format: JP 9440199 | [2002/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1211436 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1211436 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | [2002/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/66 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
F16H3/663 (EP,US);
F16H3/44 (KR);
F16H2200/0047 (EP,US);
F16H2200/0052 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2007 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2023 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/23] | Title | German: | Automatisches Getriebe für Fahrzeuge | [2002/23] | English: | Automatic transmission for vehicle | [2002/23] | French: | Transmission automatique pour véhicules | [2002/23] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/52] | 26.07.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99110795.4 / EP0962680 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5503604 (PIERCE STANLEY L [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5106352 (LEPELLETIER PIERRE A G [FR]) [A] 1 * figure 3 * | by applicant | US5342257 |