EP1241478 - Method for detecting the pathogenesis and/or diagnosing transmissible spongiform encephalopathies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menzel, Ingrid, Dr. Ferdinandstrasse 12 61348 Bad Homburg v.d. H. / DE | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/48] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/38] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005564.6 | 12.03.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | DE20011012097 | 12.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10112097 | [2002/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1241478 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1241478 | Date: | 04.08.2004 | [2004/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1241478 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68, G01N33/569, G01N33/84, C12Q1/37, C12Q1/527, C12Q1/32, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/42, C12Q1/68 | [2004/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/6896 (EP);
G01N2800/2828 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/38] | G01N33/569, G01N33/84, C12Q1/37, C12Q1/527, C12Q1/32, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/42, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erfassung der Pathogenese und/oder zur Diagnose von 'transmissiblen spongiformen Enzephalopathien' | [2002/38] | English: | Method for detecting the pathogenesis and/or diagnosing transmissible spongiform encephalopathies | [2002/38] | French: | Méthode pour la détection de la pathogenèse et/ou le diagnostic des encéphalopathies spongiformes transmissibles | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/11] | 07.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.08.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.12.2006 | DK | 20.12.2006 | FI | 20.12.2006 | FR | 20.12.2006 | GB | 20.12.2006 | IE | 20.12.2006 | IT | 20.12.2006 | NL | 20.12.2006 | TR | 20.12.2006 | LU | 12.03.2007 | SE | 20.03.2007 | GR | 21.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | ES | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | PT | 23.04.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 20.12.2006 | |
DK | 20.12.2006 | ||
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
FR | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
LU | 12.03.2007 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
FR | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
FR | 10.08.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
GR | 21.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
GB | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 20.12.2006 | |
FI | 20.12.2006 | ||
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/42] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
IE | 20.12.2006 | ||
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
NL | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
ES | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
IT | 20.12.2006 | ||
SE | 20.03.2007 | ||
PT | 23.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 20.12.2006 | |
SE | 20.03.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4678748 (SUTKA PAL [HU], et al) [X] 12 * column 1 - column 3 *; | [X]US4772551 (HART L PATRICK [US], et al) [X] 12,14,15 * column 1 - column 9 *; | [A]US5409814 (BERRY MICHAEL N [AU], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * column 1 - column 8 *; | [AD]WO9813694 (KING S COLLEGE [GB], et al) [AD] * page 1 - page 8 *; | [AD]WO9947932 (KING S COLLEGE UNIVERSITY OF L [GB], et al) [AD] 1,3 * page 1 - page 1 *; | [AD]WO0029850 (WALLAC OY [FI], et al) [AD] * page 1 - page 33 *; | [A]WO0031545 (KING S COLLEGE [GB], et al) [A] * page 1 - page 7 *; | [XY] - PRATT D E ET AL, "FAST ATOM BOMBARDMENT MASS SPECTROMETRY METHOD FOR MONITORING ZINC AND CALCIUM STABLE ISOTOPES IN BIOAVAILABILITY STUDIES", JOURNAL OF MICRONUTRIENT ANALYSIS, (1987), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 0266-349X, pages 107 - 118, XP008030628 [X] 12-14 * page 107 - page 117 * [Y] 16 | [XY] - DANKS D M, "DIAGNOSIS OF TRACE METAL DEFICIENCY WITH EMPHASIS ON COPPER AND ZINC", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL NUTRITION, (1981), vol. 34, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9165, pages 278 - 280, XP008030549 [X] 12 * page 278 - page 280 * [Y] 16 | [X] - LIU REN-MIN ET AL, "Simultaneous determination of multicomponents by flow injection analysis", TALANTA, (1993), vol. 40, no. 4, ISSN 0039-9140, pages 511 - 514, XP008030621 [X] 12,13 * page 511 - page 511 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0039-9140(93)80009-G | [A] - AHLSKOG J E ET AL, "Guamanian neurodegenerative disease: Investigation of the calcium metabolism/heavy metal hypothesis", NEUROLOGY, (1995), vol. 45, no. 7, ISSN 0028-3878, pages 1340 - 1344, XP008030551 [A] 1-15 * page 1340 - page 1344 * | [A] - BELLISOLA G ET AL, "Use of total-reflection X-ray fluorescence to track the metabolism and excretion of selenium in humans", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 7TH CONFERENCE ON TOTAL REFLECTION X-RAY FLUORESCENCE ANALYSIS AND RELATED METHODS (TXRF'98);AUSTIN, TX, USA SEP 27-OCT 3 1998, Spectrochim. Acta Part B At. Spectrosc.;Spectrochimica Acta - Part B Atomic Spectroscopy 1999 Elsevier Science B.V., Amsterdam, Netherlands, (19980927), vol. 54, no. 10, pages 1481 - 1485, XP002280018 [A] 1-15 * page 1481 - page 1485 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0584-8547(99)00065-8 | [A] - WARRELL R P JR ET AL, "PHASE I EVALUATION OF SUCCINYLATED ACINETOBACTER-GLUTAMINASIFICANS GLUTAMINASE ASPARAGINASE IN ADULTS", CANCER RESEARCH, (1980), vol. 40, no. 12, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4546 - 4551, XP008030123 [A] * page 1 - page 1 * |