EP1249285 - Method for the manufacture of a fitting for a heating radiator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/42] | Method for the manufacture of a fitting for a heating radiator as well as a heating radiator | ||
[2006/34] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states König, Christel Gärtnerweg 8 63674 Altenstadt-Heegheim / DE | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Wunderlich, Rainer, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Wunderlich, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Weber & Heim Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005638.8 | 12.03.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | DE2001204315U | 13.03.2001 Original published format: DE 20104315 U | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249285 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249285 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | [2003/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249285 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B21C37/29, B21K1/16, F28F9/26 | [2003/40] | CPC: |
F24D19/0002 (EP);
F24D19/0073 (EP);
F28F9/262 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | B21C37/29, B21K1/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Anschlussteiles für einen Heizkörper | [2006/34] | English: | Method for the manufacture of a fitting for a heating radiator | [2006/34] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un raccord pour un radiateur de chauffage | [2006/34] |
Former [2002/42] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Anschlussteiles für einen Heizkörper sowie Heizkörperanordnung | ||
Former [2002/42] | Method for the manufacture of a fitting for a heating radiator as well as a heating radiator | ||
Former [2002/42] | Procédé de fabrication d'un raccord pour un radiateur de chauffage ainsi que radiateur de chauffage | Examination procedure | 22.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/21] | 05.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 10.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2007
25.11.2009
WITHDRAWN Hans Berg GmbH & Co. KG Talsperrenstrasse 4-6 51580 Reichshof / DE Opponent's representative Ksoll, Peter, et al, et al Bockermann Ksoll Griepenstroh Osterhoff Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2007
25.11.2009
WITHDRAWN Hans Berg GmbH & Co. KG Talsperrenstrasse 4-6 51580 Reichshof / DE Opponent's representative Ksoll, Peter, et al, et al Bockermann - Ksoll - Griepenstroh Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 D-44791 Bochum / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.10.2007
Hans Berg GmbH & Co. KG Talsperrenstrasse 4-6 51580 Reichshof / DE Opponent's representative Ksoll, Peter, et al, et al Bockermann - Ksoll - Griepenstroh Patentanwälte Bergstrasse 159 D-44791 Bochum / DE | 13.12.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.06.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 26.09.2010 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.09.2004 | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   03.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.01.2007 | DK | 31.01.2007 | FI | 31.01.2007 | FR | 31.01.2007 | GB | 31.01.2007 | IE | 31.01.2007 | IT | 31.01.2007 | NL | 31.01.2007 | TR | 31.01.2007 | AT | 12.03.2007 | LU | 12.03.2007 | BE | 31.03.2007 | CH | 31.03.2007 | LI | 31.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | SE | 30.04.2007 | GR | 01.05.2007 | ES | 12.05.2007 | PT | 02.07.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
AT | 12.03.2007 | ||
LU | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 31.01.2007 | |
DK | 31.01.2007 | ||
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
AT | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
FR | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
AT | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
AT | 12.03.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
FR | 21.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
IT | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
FR | 21.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
GR | 01.05.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
CH | 31.03.2007 | ||
LI | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
GB | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
IE | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
PT | 02.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 31.01.2007 | |
FI | 31.01.2007 | ||
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/39] | FI | 31.01.2007 | |
NL | 31.01.2007 | ||
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
ES | 12.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/38] | FI | 31.01.2007 | |
SE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 31.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2224670 (CRILEY WILLIAM W) [X] 1,2,9,10* the whole document *; | [X]GB1113048 (ALFRED CLAY ARBOGAST) [X] 1,2,7,9,10 * page 1, line 44 - line 51 * * page 3, line 66 - page 5, line 13; figures 1-12 *; | [X]DE3113207 (BUEDINGER METALLWARENFABRIK GM [DE]) [X] 1,3,10,11 * page 12 - page 13; figures 1-4,5b,6b *; | [X]EP0166796 (KONIG HARRY) [X] 1,2,10-12 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7 - page 10; figures 1-7 * |