EP1241593 - Method and system for interacting with devices having different capabilities [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2002/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schechter, Greg D. 1127 37th Avenue East Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 02 /
Niyogi, Shanku S. 228 West Lake Sammamish Parway SE Bellevue, Washington 98008 / US | 03 /
Kurlander, David J. 633 14th Avenue East Seattle, Washington 98112 / US | 04 /
Nye, Kris N. 11028 NE 143rd Street Kirkland, Washington 98034 / US | [2002/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02005786.5 | 13.03.2002 | [2002/38] | Priority number, date | US20010276394P | 16.03.2001 Original published format: US 276394 P | US20010934122 | 20.08.2001 Original published format: US 934122 | [2002/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1241593 | Date: | 18.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1241593 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2002/38] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System um mit Geräten die verschiedene Fähigkeiten haben zu interagieren | [2002/38] | English: | Method and system for interacting with devices having different capabilities | [2002/38] | French: | Procédé et système pour interagir avec des dispositifs qui ont différentes aptitudes | [2002/38] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.10.2012 | 05.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/47] | 29.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA] - MARC ABRAMS & CONTANTINOS PHANOURIOU, "UIML: An XML Language for Building Device-Independent User Interfaces", XML CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS. PROCEEDINGS OF XML, (199912), XP002161335 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 35 * * page 3, line 5 - page 3, line 41 * * page 4, line 12 - page 7, line 41 * * page 8, line 16 - page 8, line 21 * * page 10, line 11 - page 11, line 19 * [A] 14-20 | [YA] - FLAMMIA G., "THE WIRELESS INTERNET TODAY AND TOMOROW", IEEE INTELLIGENT SYSTEMS, IEEE, USA, vol. 15, (200009), pages 82 - 83, URL: http://ieeexplore.ieee.org/search/wrapper.jsp?arnumber=889109, (200604), XP002381052 [Y] 1-7 * page 82, column L, line 25 - page 82, column M, line 13 * * page 83, column L, line 42 - page 83, column R, line 31 * [A] 14-20 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5254.889109 | [A] - ABRAMS M ET AL, "UIML: an appliance-independent XML user interface language", COMPUTER NETWORKS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (19990517), vol. 31, no. 11-16, ISSN 1389-1286, pages 1695 - 1708, XP004304584 [A] 1-7,14-20 * abstract * * page 1696, column R, line 3 - page 1697, column L, line 6 * * page 1700, column L, line 19 - page 1700, column R, line 20 * * page 1701, column L, line 1 - page 1703, column L, line 12 * * page 1703, column R, line 34 - page 1704, column L, line 10 * * page 1705, column L, line 24 - page 1705, column R, line 32 * * page 1706, column L, line 29 - page 1707, column L, line 12 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1389-1286(99)00044-4 | [A] - KAASINEN EIJA ET AL, "Two approaches to bringing internet services to WAP devices", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS, NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (2000), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0169-7552, pages 231 - 246, XP002164665 [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 232, column R, line 29 - page 233, column L, line 3 * * page 234, column R, line 13 - page 235, column R, line 42 * * page 239, column L, line 34 - page 239, column L, line 42 * | [A] - "Spyglass Prism 3.1 Supports the latest Standards for TRansmission of Content to Wireless Devices", INTERNET CITATION, (20000705), XP002160099 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [X] - MULLER-WILKEN S ET AL, "On integrating mobile devices into a workflow management scenario", DATABASE AND EXPERT SYSTEMS APPLICATIONS, 2000. PROCEEDINGS. 11TH INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON 4-8 SEPTEMBER 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000904), ISBN 0-7695-0680-1, pages 186 - 190, XP010515493 [X] 14-20 * abstract * * page 186, column L, line 39 - page 186, column R, line 8 * * page 187, column L, line 10 - page 188, column L, line 8 * * page 188, column L, line 47 - page 188, column R, line 41 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DEXA.2000.875024 |