EP1344793 - Polyolefin composition with improved properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O. Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/38] | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O.Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernreitner, Klaus Zaubertalstrasse 1 4010 Linz / AT | 02 /
Hauer, Andreas Wetterbergweg 17 4203 Altenberg / AT | 03 /
Gubo, Robert Gföllnerstrasse 18 4730 Waizenkirchen / AT | [2003/38] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/38] | VA TECH Patente GmbH & Co Stahlstrasse 21a 4031 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 02005953.1 | 15.03.2002 | [2003/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1344793 | Date: | 17.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1344793 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/20, C08L23/10 | [2003/38] | CPC: |
C08K5/0083 (EP);
C08F210/06 (EP);
C08K5/20 (EP);
C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L2207/02 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/06, C08F2/001 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17 (EP);
C08K5/0083, C08L23/10 (EP);
C08K5/20, C08L53/00 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/38] | Title | German: | Polyolefinmischung mit verbesserten Eigenschaften | [2003/38] | English: | Polyolefin composition with improved properties | [2003/38] | French: | Composition de polyolèfines ayant des propriétés améliorées | [2003/38] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 13.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/20] | Request for further processing for: | 20.12.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.01.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2006 | BE | 07.06.2006 | CH | 07.06.2006 | CY | 07.06.2006 | FI | 07.06.2006 | LI | 07.06.2006 | NL | 07.06.2006 | TR | 07.06.2006 | DK | 07.09.2006 | SE | 07.09.2006 | GR | 08.09.2006 | ES | 18.09.2006 | PT | 07.11.2006 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
CY | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
GR | 08.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
IT | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
DK | 07.09.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
NL | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
BE | 07.06.2006 | ||
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
PT | 07.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
CH | 07.06.2006 | ||
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
LI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 07.06.2006 | |
FI | 07.06.2006 | ||
SE | 07.09.2006 | ||
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 07.09.2006 | |
ES | 18.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 07.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1188279 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1-11 * examples 3,5 *; | [A]US5310584 (JACOBY PHILIP [US], et al) [A] 1-11* column 11, line 11 - line 12; examples 1-4 *; | [A]EP0682066 (DANUBIA PETROCHEM POLYMERE [AT]) [A] 1-11 * example 15 * |