EP1248225 - Pattern-collating device, pattern-collating method and pattern-collating program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/41] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monden, Akira NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006178.4 | 19.03.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | JP20010092246 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001092246 | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248225 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248225 | Date: | 07.09.2005 | [2005/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1248225 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
G06V40/1365 (EP,US);
G06V10/40 (KR);
G06V10/757 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/41] | G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2006/21] |
Former [2002/41] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, Verfahren und Programm zum Vergleichen von Mustern | [2002/41] | English: | Pattern-collating device, pattern-collating method and pattern-collating program | [2002/41] | French: | Dispositif, procédé et logiciel pour la comparaison de modèles | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/05] | 27.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.05.2007 | NL | 16.05.2007 | SE | 16.08.2007 | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/09] | NL | 16.05.2007 | |
SE | 16.08.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | SE | 16.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0866424 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 43 *; | [A]US6185318 (JAIN ANIL K [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * column 8, line 28 - line 62 *; | [A] - JAIN A ET AL, "ON-LINE FINGERPRINT VERIFICATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199704), vol. 19, no. 4, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 302 - 313, XP000690650 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.587996 | [A] - SHINKI UMEYAMA, "A POINT PATTERN MATCHING ALGORITHM", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, SCRIPTA TECHNICA JOURNALS. NEW YORK, US, (19891001), vol. 20, no. 10, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 95 - 106, XP000128838 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |