EP1226894 - Device for connecting a tool head to a clamping shaft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Komet Group GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 3 74354 Besigheim / DE | [2009/40] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states KOMET GROUP Holding GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 3 74354 Besigheim / DE | ||
Former [2002/31] | For all designated states KOMET Präzisionswerkzeuge Robert Breuning GmbH Zeppelinstr. 3 D-74354 Besigheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stolz, Gerhard Weidenweg 12 74379 Ingersheim / DE | [2011/26] |
Former [2002/31] | 01 /
Stol, Gerhard Weidenweg 12 74379 Ingersheim / DE | Representative(s) | Wolf, Eckhard, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/31] | Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006426.7 | 21.01.1999 | [2002/31] | Priority number, date | DE1998102334 | 23.01.1998 Original published format: DE 19802334 | DE1998121484 | 14.05.1998 Original published format: DE 19821484 | DE1998152397 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19852397 | DE1998160184 | 24.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19860184 | [2002/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1226894 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1226894 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1226894 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B23B29/04 | [2002/31] | CPC: |
B23B31/06 (EP);
B23B29/04 (KR);
B23B29/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2002/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Verbinden eines Werkzeugkopfs mit einem Spannschaft | [2002/31] | English: | Device for connecting a tool head to a clamping shaft | [2002/31] | French: | Dispositif de connection d' une tête d' outil à une broche de serrage | [2002/31] | Examination procedure | 24.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/10] | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99906180.7 / EP1056563 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19990906180) is 07.05.2002 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.07.2011 | BE | 31.01.2012 | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/31] | DK | 06.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE9212205U (GILDEMEISTER-DEVLIEG) [AD] 1 * page 5, line 6 - line 8; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4220873 (GUEHRING JOERG DR [DE]); | [A]WO9516533 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]) |