EP1346621 - Soil working machine tine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rabe Agrarsysteme GmbH & Co. KG Am Rabewerk 1 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2003/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2003/39] | Application number, filing date | 02006433.3 | 22.03.2002 | [2003/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1346621 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A01B23/02, A01B33/10 | [2003/39] | CPC: |
A01B33/10 (EP);
A01B23/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2004/25] |
Former [2003/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Zinken für ein Bodenbearbeitungsgerät | [2003/39] | English: | Soil working machine tine | [2003/39] | French: | Dent pour machine de travail du sol | [2003/39] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/50] | 25.03.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 10.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.05.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.05.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH115047 (HUG JOHANNES [CH]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]US1965950 (WALKER CARROLL M) [X] 1-5 * page 1, line 100 - page 2, line 37; figure - * [Y] 6,7; | [Y]FR2306610 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [Y] 7 * figure 6 *; | [A]AU7444081 (DOMAN JOHN TOM ARTHUR) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]DE8801316U (FABRITZ) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [Y]DE29814840U (RDZ DUTZI GMBH [DE]) [Y] 6 * page 4, paragraphs 4,5; figure - * | by applicant | EP0108877 | EP0737415 |