EP1246260 - Optoelectronic coupling device and method of fabrication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buchberger, Rudolf Klenzestrasse 71 80469 München / DE | 02 /
Halbritter, Hubert Am Arzberg 3 92345 Dietfurt - Töging / DE | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006468.9 | 22.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | DE20011015440 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: DE 10115440 | [2002/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1246260 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1246260 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1246260 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/173, H01L31/18, H01L33/00 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
H01L31/173 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/43] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optoelektronische Koppelvorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren | [2002/40] | English: | Optoelectronic coupling device and method of fabrication | [2002/40] | French: | Dispositif optoélectronique de couplage et méthode de fabrication | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/20] | 08.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3206069 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | [A]EP0645827 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US5581094 (HARA KUNIHIKO [JP], et al); |