EP1253796 - Method of selecting a network access measure from multiple access measures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.06.2006 [2006/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DoCoMo Communications Laboratories USA, Inc. 181 Metro Drive, Suite 300 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states DoCoMo Communications Laboratories USA, Inc. 181 Metro Drive, Suite 300 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurakake, Shoji 181 Metro Drive, Suite 300 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | 02 /
Hagan, William Alexander 181 Metro Drive, Suite 300 San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006599.1 | 22.03.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | US20010844997 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: US 844997 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253796 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1253796 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/32 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W12/35 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/44] | H04Q7/38 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/42] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Methode zur Auswahl eines Netwerkzugriffsmitteln aus verschiedenen Zugriffsmittels | [2002/44] | English: | Method of selecting a network access measure from multiple access measures | [2002/44] | French: | Procédé de sélection d'un moyen d'accès de réseaux de plusieur moyen d'accès | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/26] | 09.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2313257 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,6-11,14-18 * abstract * * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 24 * * page 6, line 8 - line 22 * * page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 33 * * figure 2; claims 1-4,8-10,12-16 * [Y] 5,12,13,19,20; | [X]US5862480 (WILD JOHANNA ALEXANDRA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * abstract * * column 4, lines 40-42 * * column 5, line 14 - line 38 * * column 8, line 65 - column 9, line 25 * * column 9, line 36 - column 16, line 32 ** figures 3,11-19 *; | [YA] - PUETZ S ET AL, "SECURE INTEROPERATION BETWEEN 2G AND 3G MOBILE RADIO NETWORKS", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 3G MOBILE COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, XX, XX, (20000327), pages 28 - 32, XP001016360 [Y] 5,12,13,19,20 * page 28, column R * * page 29, column L, paragraph 9 - page 31, paragraph 1 * * figures 2,3 * [A] 3,4 |