EP1243306 - Device for gas separation by adsorption [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/39] | Device and process for gas separation by adsorption | ||
[2004/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brugerolle, Jean-Renaud 9, rue des Bauches 75016 Paris / FR | 02 /
Monereau, Christian 159, rue de Charonne 75011 Paris / FR | [2002/39] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02006749.2 | 14.05.1996 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | FR19950005956 | 19.05.1995 Original published format: FR 9505956 | [2002/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1243306 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1243306 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243306 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/047, B01D53/04, B01D53/053 | [2002/39] | CPC: |
B01D53/0476 (EP,US);
B01D53/047 (KR);
B01D53/0446 (EP,KR,US);
B01D53/053 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2256/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2259/40007 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2259/40015 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2259/4003 (EP,KR,US);
B01D2259/40052 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40056 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40064 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40066 (EP,US);
B01D2259/40088 (EP,US);
B01D2259/401 (EP,US);
B01D2259/402 (EP,US);
B01D53/0473 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2002/39] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Gastrennung mittels Adsorption | [2004/46] | English: | Device for gas separation by adsorption | [2004/46] | French: | Dispositif de séparation de gaz par absorption | [2002/39] |
Former [2002/39] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Gastrennung mittels Adsorption | ||
Former [2002/39] | Device and process for gas separation by adsorption | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 04.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96401045.8 / EP0743087 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.05.2005 | SE | 11.08.2005 | [2006/22] |
Former [2005/50] | SE | 11.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2138663 (SULZER AG) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 15 - page 4, line 12; figures 1,2; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US5370728 (LASALA KIMBERLY A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 22; figure 1; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO8805693 (RAD SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 3; figures 2A,3A *; | [A]DE3405260 (GRAEFF RODERICH WILHELM) [A] 1-11 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 2; figure 1; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0525521 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP0038410 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figure 1; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE2337754 (GRACE W R & CO) [A] 1-11 * figures 4,5; claims 1-15 * |