EP1338807 - Anchoring device for an anti-fall down security system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trendy S.P.R.L. Zoning Industriel Rue de Charleroi, 38 6180 Courcelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Trendy S.P.R.L. Zoning Industriel Rue de Charleroi, 38 6180 Courcelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brenez, Philippe Avenue Grand Air, 20 1640 Rhode-St-Genese / BE | [2003/35] | Representative(s) | Cauchie, Daniel Office Parette (Fred Maes) Avenue Gabrielle Petit 2 7940 Brugelette / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | Cauchie, Daniel Office Parette (Fred Maes), Avenue Gabrielle Petit 2 7940 Brugelette / BE | Application number, filing date | 02006876.3 | 26.03.2002 | [2003/35] | Priority number, date | BE20020000111 | 21.02.2002 Original published format: BE 200200111 | [2003/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1338807 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1338807 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | FR | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16B45/00, F16B39/10 | [2003/35] | CPC: |
F16B45/015 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/35] | Title | German: | Verankerungsvorrichtung für ein Anti-Sturz Sicherheitssystem | [2003/35] | English: | Anchoring device for an anti-fall down security system | [2003/35] | French: | Dispositif d'ancrage pour systeme de securite anti-chute | [2003/35] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 02.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.10.2004 | FI | 06.10.2004 | GB | 06.10.2004 | IE | 06.10.2004 | IT | 06.10.2004 | NL | 06.10.2004 | TR | 06.10.2004 | DK | 06.01.2005 | GR | 06.01.2005 | ES | 17.01.2005 | PT | 06.03.2005 | CY | 26.03.2005 | MC | 31.03.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
IT | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
CY | 26.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
TR | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
MC | 31.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GB | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
NL | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
IE | 06.10.2004 | ||
DK | 06.01.2005 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 06.10.2004 | |
FI | 06.10.2004 | ||
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
ES | 17.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 06.10.2004 | |
GR | 06.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 06.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4135693 (MIAVITZ FREDERICK J); | [A]DE3508760 (GLASS HORST); | [A]DE20021334U (THEILE J D GMBH [DE]) |