EP1249522 - Oxygen doping method for a gallium nitride single crystal substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/42] | Oxygen doping method for a gallium nitride single crystal substrate and oxygen-doped N-type gallium nitride freestanding single crystal substrate | ||
[2007/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [2008/18] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motoki, Kensaku c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | 02 /
Ueno, Masaki c/o Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome, Itami-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006925.8 | 26.03.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010113872 | 12.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001113872 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249522 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249522 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249522 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/40, C30B25/02, C30B33/00, H01L21/205, C23C16/30 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
C30B23/00 (EP,US);
C30B23/02 (EP,US);
C30B25/00 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B29/403 (EP,US);
C30B29/406 (EP,US);
C30B29/60 (EP,US);
C30B33/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/02389 (EP,US);
H01L21/02395 (EP,US);
H01L21/02433 (EP,US);
H01L21/0254 (EP,US);
H01L21/02576 (EP,US);
H01L21/02609 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | C30B29/40, C30B25/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/09] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sauerstoffdotierungs-Verfahren für ein einkristallines Galliumnitrid-Substrat | [2007/41] | English: | Oxygen doping method for a gallium nitride single crystal substrate | [2007/41] | French: | Procédé pour le dopage par l'oxygène d'un substrat monocristallin de nitrure de gallium | [2007/41] |
Former [2002/42] | Sauerstoffdotierungsverfahren für ein einkristallines Galliumnitrid Substrat und ein mit Sauerstoff-dotiertem N-Typ freistehendes Substrat aus Galliumnitrid | ||
Former [2002/42] | Oxygen doping method for a gallium nitride single crystal substrate and oxygen-doped N-type gallium nitride freestanding single crystal substrate | ||
Former [2002/42] | Procédé pour le dopage par l'oxygène d'un substrat monocristallin de nitrure de gallium et substrat de nitrure de gallium autoportant dopé par l'oxygène et du type-N | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 14.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07016498.3 / EP1873280 | EP09001463.0 / EP2060663 | Opposition(s) | 02.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000044400 ; | [A]EP0967664 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1,6,11,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0034] *; | [X]EP1088914 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0076] , [0077] , [0162] , [0194] - [0204] *; | [PX]EP1172464 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PX] 1-5,11-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0209] - [0235] *; | [A] - HIRAMATSU K ET AL, "Selective area growth and epitaxial lateral overgrowth of GaN by metalorganic vapor phase epitaxy and hydride vapor phase epitaxy", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, (19990506), vol. 59, no. 1-3, ISSN 0921-5107, pages 104 - 111, XP004173214 [A] 1-20 * abstract * * page 108, column 2 - page 109, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0921-5107(98)00339-0 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000044400 A 20000215 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC IND LTD) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |