EP1273864 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modine Manufacturing Company 1500 DeKoven Avenue Racine, Wisconsin 53403-2552 / US | [2003/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalbacher, Klaus Schmeläckerstrasse 6 72414 Rangendingen / DE | [2003/02] | Representative(s) | Wolter, Klaus-Dietrich Modine Europe GmbH Patentabteilung 70790 Filderstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Wolter, Klaus-Dietrich Modine Europe GmbH Patentabteilung 70790 Filderstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 02006977.9 | 27.03.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | DE2001132617 | 05.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10132617 | [2003/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1273864 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1273864 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273864 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/053, F28F9/02 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
F28F21/067 (EP,US);
F28D1/0535 (EP,US);
F28F9/0226 (EP,US);
F28F9/0229 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49389 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/02] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2003/02] | English: | Heat exchanger | [2003/02] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 13.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.06.2004 | IE | 02.06.2004 | NL | 02.06.2004 | TR | 02.06.2004 | DK | 02.09.2004 | GR | 02.09.2004 | PT | 02.11.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/52] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
TR | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
NL | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
DK | 02.09.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
IE | 02.06.2004 | ||
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 02.06.2004 | |
GR | 02.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 02.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS59129395 ; | [A]US3415315 (DONALDSON DESMOND M, et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 48 - line 65; figure - *; | [A]EP0334817 (BORLETTI CLIMATIZZAZIONE [IT]) [A] 4* abstract *; | [Y]US4903389 (WOLF PETER G [US]) [Y] 1,3,5 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2742528 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 4 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2783907 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 20 - column 7, line 25; figure - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841127), vol. 008, no. 258, Database accession no. (M - 340), & JP59129395 A 19840725 (NIPPON DENSO KK) [Y] 1,3,5 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0479012 |