EP1245602 - Cleaning blade and electrophotographic apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2 Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2 Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2 Kukizaki, Kukizaki-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Toshinari c/o Canon K. K. 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Okabe, Takako, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Hatanaka, Taku, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 04 /
INOUE, Shoji, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 05 /
Nakano, Naohiko, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [2012/01] |
Former [2011/17] | 01 /
Miura, Toshinari c/o Canon K. K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Okabe, Takako, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Hatanaka, Taku, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
04 /
INOUE, Shoji, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Nakano, Naohiko, c/o Canon Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1888-2, Kukizaki Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | |||
Former [2002/40] | 01 /
Miura, Toshinari c/o Canon K. K., 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Okabe, Takako, c/o Canon Kasei K. K. 1888-2, Kukizaki, Kukizaki-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-gun / JP | |||
03 /
Hatanaka, Taku, c/o Canon Kasei K. K. 1888-2, Kukizaki, Kukizaki-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-gun / JP | |||
04 /
Inoue, Shoji, c/o Canon Kasei K. K. 1888-2, Kukizaki, Kukizaki-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-gun / JP | |||
05 /
Nakano, Naohiko, c/o Canon Kasei K. K. 1888-2, Kukizaki, Kukizaki-machi Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki-gun / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/01] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/40] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007151.0 | 28.03.2002 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | JP20010095802 | 29.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001095802 | [2002/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1245602 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1245602 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/12, C08G18/20, C08G18/22, C08G18/42, G03G21/00 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
A63H1/20 (KR);
C08G18/163 (EP,US);
C08G18/4238 (EP,US);
C25D5/02 (EP);
C25D5/14 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/3206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/26] |
Former [2002/40] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Reinigungsklinge und elektrophotographisches Gerät, dieses benutzend | [2002/40] | English: | Cleaning blade and electrophotographic apparatus using the same | [2002/40] | French: | Lame de nettoyage et appareil electrophotographique en utilisant | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4900776 (BOCK FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 65 - column 4, line 3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0622709 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,3,5,6 * page 3, line 15 - line 47 ** examples 1-3; table 1 *; | [A]US5866667 (SUZUKI SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6 * page 1, line 60 - page 4, line 58 * * examples 1,8; tables 1,4 * |