EP1308459 - Full-length cDNA sequences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Association for Biotechnology 3-9, Nishi-Shimbashi 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/28] | For all designated states Research Association for Biotechnology 3-9, Nishi-Shimbashi 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | ||
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Helix Research Institute 1532-3 Yana Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0812 / JP | ||
For all designated states Research Association for Biotechnology 3-9, Nishi-Shimbashi 2-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0003 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isogai, Takao 511-12, Omuro Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-0303 / JP | 02 /
Sugiyama, Tomoyasu 5-4-3-512, Yokokawa, Sumida-ku Tokyo 130-0003 / JP | 03 /
Otsuki, Tetsuji 3-1-10-B102, Asahi Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0055 / JP | 04 /
Wakamatsu, Ai 1473-4-202, Takayanagi Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0014 / JP | 05 /
Sato, Hiroyuki 8-7-20-308 Hon-cho Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0021 / JP | 06 /
Ishii, Shizuko 4508-19-202 Yana Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0812 / JP | 07 /
Yamamoto, Jun-ichi 3-28-3-A101, Kiyomidaihigashi Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0041 / JP | 08 /
Isono, Yuuko 1485-A203, Takayanagi Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0014 / JP | 09 /
Hio, Yuri 4508-19-201, Yana Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0812 / JP | 10 /
Otsuka, Kaoru 2-8-6-A101, Maehara Honjo-shi, Saitama 367-0047 / JP | 11 /
Nagai, Keiichi 3-44-14-9-204, Sakuragaoka Yamato-shi, Tokyo 207-0022 / JP | 12 /
Irie, Ryotaro 1-25-13-103, Jozai Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0801 / JP | 13 /
Tamechika, Ichiro 4-5-303, Okayamate-cho Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0034 / JP | 14 /
Seki, Naohiko 2-6-1-1305, Saiwai-cho, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 261-0001 / JP | 15 /
Yoshikawa, Tsutomu 4-13-21-102, Higashiota Kisarazu-shi, Chiba 292-0043 / JP | 16 /
Otsuka, Motoyuki 7-7-7, Aoto, Katsuhika-ku Tokyo 125-0062 / JP | 17 /
Nagahari, Kenji 4-16-6, Nishiogiminami, Suginami-ku Tokyo 167-0053 / JP | 18 /
Masuho, Yasuhiko 5-19-15, Higashi-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184-0011 / JP | [2003/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007401.9 | 28.03.2002 | [2003/19] | Priority number, date | JP20010379298 | 05.11.2001 Original published format: JP 2001379298 | US20020350978 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: US 350978 | [2003/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1308459 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1308459 | Date: | 09.07.2003 | [2003/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C07K16/18, C12Q1/68, G01N33/68 | [2003/19] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/14] |
Former [2003/19] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vollständige cDNA-Sequenzen | [2003/19] | English: | Full-length cDNA sequences | [2003/19] | French: | Séquences d'ADN complementaires pleine longueur | [2003/19] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/09] | 10.10.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9821328 (SAGAMI CHEM RES [JP], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph L * * page 108 - page 109 * * page 160 - page 162 *; | [X]WO9829437 (UNIV ALBERTA [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 4 * * figures 2,3; examples 7-9 *; | [A]WO9840485 (GENETICS INST [US]) [A] 1 * page 5, line 33 - page 7, line 27 *; | [A]EP0866126 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [A] 1 * page 13; example 1 *; | [X]WO9846749 (ST JUDE CHILDRENS RES HOSPITAL [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 5, line 23 - page 11, line 10; examples 1-3 *; | [X]WO0104286 (HELIX RES INST [JP], et al)[X] 1; | [A]WO0107607 (HELIX RES INST [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1195434 (HELIX RES INST [JP]) [E] 1 * the whole document, especially examples 7 and 8 *; | [X] - STRAUSBERG, R. ET AL., "Human clone MGC:3778, complete mRNA, similar to solute carrier family 29 nucleoside transporter", EM_HUM, EMBL, (20010309), Database accession no. BC001382, URL: BC001382, XP002229929 [X] 1,2,5,9 * abstract * | [X] - GRIFFITHS M ET AL, "CLONING OF A HUMAN NUCLEOSIDE TRANSPORTER IMPLICATED IN THE CELLULAR UPTAKE OF ADENOSINE AND CHEMOTHERAPEUTIC DRUGS", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUBLISHING, CO, US, (1997), vol. 3, no. 1, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 89 - 93, XP002071071 [X] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0197-89 |