EP1350828 - Liquid bubble solution for producing luminous bubbles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Mon-Sheng 5th Floor, No.4, Lane 7, Pao Kao Road Hsintien Taipei Hsien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Lin, Mon-Sheng 5th Floor, No.4, Lane 7, Pao Kao Road Hsintien, Taipei Hsien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/41] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/41] | Casalonga, Axel Bureau D.A. Casalonga-Josse Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007558.6 | 03.04.2002 | [2003/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1350828 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1350828 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/06, A63H33/28 | [2003/41] | CPC: |
C09K11/025 (EP,US);
A63H33/28 (EP,US);
C09K11/02 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C09K2211/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/41] | Title | German: | Flüssige Seifenblasenlösung zur Herstellung leuchtender Seifenblasen | [2003/41] | English: | Liquid bubble solution for producing luminous bubbles | [2003/41] | French: | Solution liquide pour la production des bulles de savon luminescentes | [2003/41] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/15] | 04.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.11.2004 | FR | 17.11.2004 | IT | 17.11.2004 | TR | 17.11.2004 | GR | 17.02.2005 | DE | 18.02.2005 | CY | 03.04.2005 | LU | 03.04.2005 | IE | 04.04.2005 | PT | 17.04.2005 | MC | 30.04.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
IT | 17.11.2004 | ||
TR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
TR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
MC | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
TR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
LU | 03.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
TR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
CY | 03.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
TR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
LU | 30.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
TR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
FR | 17.11.2004 | ||
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
IE | 04.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
DE | 18.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
GR | 17.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2001098180 ; | [A]US3630951 (NETHERLY GEORGE P) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2311736 (COLOVER JOCELYN ANN [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5961894 (SWETLAND JR WALLACE BYRON [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5972590 (FRIOUR GERARD A [FR], et al) [A] 1-6* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010803), vol. 2000, no. 21, & JP2001098180 A 20010410 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |