EP1249897 - Plug and socket connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BARTEC Componenten und Systeme GmbH Max-Eyth-Str. 16 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | [2002/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barlian, Reinhold Max-Eyth-Strasse 16 97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE | 02 /
Michelbach, Thomas Am Hummelacker 5 97922 Lauda-Königshofen / DE | 03 /
Lösch, Hans-Martin Belgrader Strasse 16 97084 Würzburg / DE | 04 /
Lang, Rainer Lindenweg 1 97285 Röttingen / DE | [2002/42] | Application number, filing date | 02007596.6 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | DE2001117738 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10117738 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1249897 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249897 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/627 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
H01R13/6277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/42] | Title | German: | Steckverbindung | [2002/42] | English: | Plug and socket connector | [2002/42] | French: | Connecteur enfichable | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/42] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.01.2007 | DK | 03.01.2007 | TR | 03.01.2007 | GR | 04.04.2007 | LU | 04.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | PT | 04.06.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
LU | 04.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 03.01.2007 | |
DK | 03.01.2007 | ||
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
GR | 04.04.2007 | ||
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/46] | DK | 03.01.2007 | |
PT | 04.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | PT | 04.06.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3569903 (BRISHKA ALEXANDER R) [X] 1-9,14-17 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 26; figures 1-4; claim 1 *; | [A]GB1339801 (BUNKER RAMO) [A] 1-9,14-17 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [A]EP0050575 (RADIALL SA [FR]) [A] 1-9,14-17 * abstract *; | [A]GB2092396 (BUNKER RAMO) [A] 1,20 * abstract *; | [X]EP1001497 (DAMAR & HAGEN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-9,14-17 * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 35; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP1085615 (INTERLEMO HOLDING SA [CH]) [A] 1-9,14-17* abstract * |