EP1263086 - Slot antenna [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: IT | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH 81663 München / DE | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Solbach, Klaus, Dr. Winkhauser Weg 144 45473 Mühlheim/Ruhr / DE | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas c/o Dornier GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Meel, Thomas Patentassessor, c/o Dornier GmbH L H G 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007598.2 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001126469 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10126469 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1263086 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1263086 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263086 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q21/00, H01Q13/22, H01Q13/10 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H01Q13/22 (EP,US);
H01Q13/10 (EP,US);
H01Q21/0043 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2005/40] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schlitzstrahlerelement | [2002/49] | English: | Slot antenna | [2002/49] | French: | Antenne à fente | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 11.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/37] | IT | 28.12.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2818565 (AJIOKA JAMES S, et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 38 - line 45; figure 5 *; | [X]US3015100 (WALTER ROTMAN) [X] 1-4,6-8 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 15; figure 6 *; | [XD]DE3310531 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [XD] 1-4,6,7,9 * figures 1,2 * |