EP1248486 - Short voice message (SVM) service method, apparatus and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vuori, Petri Saarenkatu 9 24100 Salo / FI | [2002/41] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/41] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007645.1 | 04.04.2002 | [2002/41] | Priority number, date | US20010281942P | 05.04.2001 Original published format: US 281942 P | [2002/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1248486 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1248486 | Date: | 26.03.2003 | [2003/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, H04Q7/22 | [2002/41] | CPC: |
H04W4/12 (EP,US);
H04M1/72433 (EP,US);
H04M3/42382 (EP,US);
H04M3/537 (EP,US);
H04W4/14 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4527 (EP,US);
H04M2250/74 (EP,US);
H04M3/533 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/41] | Title | German: | Kurzsprachnachricht-Dienstverfahren, Gerät und System | [2002/41] | English: | Short voice message (SVM) service method, apparatus and system | [2002/41] | French: | Procédé de service pour messagerie courte à voix, appareil et système | [2002/41] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/43] | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/11] | 25.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.11.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/11] | Divisional application(s) | EP07117642.4 / EP1881724 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5724410 (PARVULESCU ADRIAN [US], et al) [X] 23-27 * column A * * figures 1-7 * * column 1, line 27 - line 31 * * column 2, line 10 - line 48 * * column 3, line 43 - line 54 * * column 4, line 8 - line 47 * * column 6, line 25 - line 41 * * claims 1-3,8,9,15,16,28 * [Y] 17-22; | [PX]EP1185068 (COMVERSE NETWORK SYSTEMS LTD [IL]) [PX] 1-16 * column A * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 5 - line 10 * * column 2, line 6 - line 16 * * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 34 * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 49 ** column 7, line 26 - line 30 *; | [XY] - "Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS);Multimedia Messaging Service (MMS), Functional description; Stage 2 (3GPP TS 23.140 version 4.2.0 Release 4)", ETSI TS 123 140 V4.2.0, XX, XX, (200103), XP002180514 [X] 1-16 * page 11, paragraph 4.1 - page 12, paragraph 4.2 * * page 14, paragraph 5.1 - page 16, paragraph 5.4 * * page 18, paragraph 6.1.2 - page 19, paragraph 6.1.3 * * page 28, paragraph 7.2 - page 29, paragraph 7.8 * * page 39, paragraph 8.15 * * figures 1,2,4-6 * [Y] 17-22 |