EP1249263 - Method for operating a cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pero Aktiengesellschaft P. Erbel Maschinen- und Apparatebau Hunnenstrasse 18 86343 Königsbrunn / DE | [2007/04] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Pero Aktiengesellschaft P. Erbel Maschinen- und Apparatebau Hunnenstrasse 18 86343 Königsbrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erbel, Horst Kopernikusstrasse 80 86179 Augsburg / DE | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Schwarz, Thomas, et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau Patentanwälte PartG mbB Fuggerstrasse 20 86150 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Schwarz, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing., et al Charrier Rapp & Liebau, Postfach 31 02 60 86063 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02007976.0 | 10.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | DE2001118601 | 12.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10118601 | [2002/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249263 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249263 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1249263 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C23G5/02, D06F43/08, F26B25/00, F26B21/08, B01D5/00, B01D53/00 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B08B3/04 (EP);
B08B2230/01 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/42] | B01D53/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2003/41] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Reinigungsanlage | [2002/42] | English: | Method for operating a cleaning device | [2002/42] | French: | Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'un dispositif de nettoyage | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/31] | 06.06.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0581113 (S VE D A S R L SOCIETA VENETA [IT]) [X] 1-3 * column 2, lines 14-34; figure . *; | [DY]DE19527317 (SEREC PARTNERS [US]) [DY] 1-3 * column 8, line 44 - column 10, line 8; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE19939032 (WOLF GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * column 5, line 4 - column 8, line 42; figure . *; | [A]US5304253 (GRANT DAVID C H [US]) [A] 1-3 * column 5, line 23 - column 7, line 40 * |