EP1249854 - Plasma display panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2007 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1, Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Pioneer Display Products Corporation 15-1, Aza-Nishinoya Washizu Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/35] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Pioneer Display Products Corporation 15-1, Aza-Nishinoya Washizu Fukuroi-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | |||
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome Meguro-ku, Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation 15-1, Aza Nishinoya, Washizu Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oishi, Toshiharu, c/o Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation 15-1, Aza Nishinoya, Washizu Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka-ken 437-0017 / JP | 02 /
Horita, Akihiko, c/o Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation 15-1, Aza Nishinoya, Washizu Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka-ken 437-0017 / JP | 03 /
Tsuboi, Hiroshi, c/o Shizuoka Pioneer Corporation 15-1, Aza Nishinoya, Washizu Fukuroi-shi, Shizuoka-ken 437-0017 / JP | [2002/42] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | Popp, Eugen, Dr., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008022.2 | 10.04.2002 | [2002/42] | Priority number, date | JP20010111228 | 10.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001111228 | [2002/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1249854 | Date: | 16.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1249854 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J5/16, H01J17/16, H01J17/49 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
H01J11/44 (EP,US);
H01J11/12 (EP,US);
H01J5/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/19] |
Former [2002/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Plasmaanzeigetafel | [2002/42] | English: | Plasma display panel | [2002/42] | French: | Panneau d'affichage à plasma | [2002/42] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2000353474 ; | [XP]EP1107280 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2 * paragraph [0030] *; | [A]US6157504 (YAMADA TSUKASA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000353474 A 20001219 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0003] , [0020] , [0025]; figures 1-5; claim 1 * [A] 2 |