EP1256489 - Electrical connecting box for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2008 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | [2007/22] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states YAZAKI CORPORATION 1-4-28, Mita Minato-ku, Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ozawa, Keisuke Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd., 2464-48, Washizu Kosai-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008124.6 | 11.04.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010114307 | 12.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001114307 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256489 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256489 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256489 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B60R16/02 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
B60R16/0238 (EP,US);
Y10S439/949 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsdose für Fahrzeuge | [2006/46] | English: | Electrical connecting box for vehicle | [2002/46] | French: | Boîtier de jonction électriques pour véhicule | [2002/46] |
Former [2002/46] | Elektrische Verbindungsdose für Fahrzeuge | Examination procedure | 11.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 23.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5057026 (SAWAI MAMORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6126457 (SMITH RANDALL KENT [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [A]EP1073148 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |