EP1254752 - Multicoloured foam sheet and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/45] | Multicoloured foam sheet, method and apparatus for its production | ||
[2006/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benecke-Kaliko Aktiengesellschaft Beneckeallee 40 D-30419 Hannover / DE | [2002/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rost, Eberhard, Dr. Hirschbachstrasse 61 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Bühring, Jürgen, Dr. Mellendorfer Strasse 6a 30938 Burgwedel / DE | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/17] | Finger, Karsten, et al Continental Aktiengesellschaft, Vahrenwalder Str. 9 30165 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Hagemann, Heinrich, Dr.rer.nat., Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte Hagemann, Braun & Held, Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008155.0 | 12.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | DE2001121518 | 03.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10121518 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1254752 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1254752 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | [2003/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1254752 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/24, B29C47/06, B29C47/04 | [2003/29] | CPC: |
B29C44/24 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | B29C44/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Title | German: | Mehrfarbige Schaumfolie und Verfahren für deren Herstellung | [2006/44] | English: | Multicoloured foam sheet and method for its production | [2006/44] | French: | Feuille en mousse multicolorée et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2006/44] |
Former [2002/45] | Mehrfarbige Schaumfolie, Verfahren sowie Vorrichtung für deren Herstellung | ||
Former [2002/45] | Multicoloured foam sheet, method and apparatus for its production | ||
Former [2002/45] | Feuille en mousse multicolorée, procédé et appareil pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 09.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 11.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 25.04.2007 | DK | 25.04.2007 | FI | 25.04.2007 | IE | 25.04.2007 | GR | 26.07.2007 | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/20] | DK | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
GR | 26.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | DK | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
IE | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | DK | 25.04.2007 | |
FI | 25.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/48] | FI | 25.04.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11348057 ; | [A]US3874833 (ANCKER FRED H) [A] 8,19 * abstract *; | [DA]DE19530757 (ALKOR GMBH [DE]); | [X]US5645889 (POTOSKY MILTON J [US], et al) [X] 1-13,16,17,19 * column 11, line 47 - column 12, line 60; figure - *; | [DA]DE19736194 (BENECKE KALIKO AG [DE]) [DA] 1,8,19-26 * figure -; claim - *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 10, Database accession no. 2000-110625, XP002242116 & JPH11348057 A 19991221 (INOAC CORP KK) [X] 1,8 * abstract * |