EP1270419 - Semi-automatic film clamp and cut device and method of operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Cook County, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alvarez, Joseph 230 Garden Court, Unit Nr. 9 Ft. Lauderdale, Florida 33308 / US | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/01] | Vetter, Ewald Otto, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR (Depotstrasse 5 1/2, 86199 Augsburg), Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008182.4 | 16.04.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | US20010892992 | 27.06.2001 Original published format: US 892992 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1270419 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270419 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B65B11/04, B65B11/02 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
B65B11/025 (EP,US);
B65B13/04 (KR);
B65B11/045 (EP,US);
Y10S83/924 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/01] | Title | German: | Halbautomatische Vorrichtung zum Klemmen und Abtrennen von Stretchfolie und Verfahren zu deren Betrieb | [2003/01] | English: | Semi-automatic film clamp and cut device and method of operating the same | [2003/01] | French: | Dispositif semi-automatique pour serrage et coupage d'un film étirable et procédé de mise en oeuvre du dispositif | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/14] | 07.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5452566 (BENHAMOU AIME [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,10,12 * column 5, line 22 - line 41; figures 1-6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0980830 (LANTECH MANAGEMENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 7, line 22 - column 11, line 7; figure 2 *; | [A]US5400575 (SCHERER PHILIP G [US]) [A] 1,12 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 23; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4204377 (LANCASTER PATRICK R [US], et al) [A] 1,12 * column 6, line 19 - column 7, line 5; figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US5572850 |