EP1357659 - Automotive alternator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oohashi, Atsushi, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-2-3, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Asao, Yoshihito, Mitsubishi Denki K. K. 2-2-3, Marunouchi, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008236.8 | 18.04.2002 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1357659 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1357659 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/14, H02K5/22, H02K11/04 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
H02K19/365 (EP,US);
H02K11/05 (EP,US);
H02K19/36 (EP);
H02K5/141 (EP);
H02K5/225 (EP);
H02K5/207 (EP,US);
H02K9/06 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/30] |
Former [2003/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wechselstromgenerator für Fahrzeuge | [2003/44] | English: | Automotive alternator | [2003/44] | French: | Alternateur de voiture | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/44] | 08.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2005 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3586892 (SATO SUGURU) [X] 1-4,6,7 * column 2, line 3 - line 29 * * column 2, line 48 - line 49 * * figures 2-5 * [Y] 5; | [A]EP0300063 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [Y]US5345132 (SASAKI SUSUMU [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 21 - line 31 * * column 4, line 59 - line 60 *; | [X]US6060802 (MASEGI MAKOTO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 19 - line 54 * * figures 1,2 * |