EP1251357 - Resistance measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acam-messelectronic GmbH Am Hasenbiel 27 76297 Stutensee-Blankenloch / DE | [2002/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Augustin Heckenweg 3 76689 Karlsdorf-Neuthard / DE | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Lempert, Jost LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Lempert, Jost LICHTI Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | ||
Former [2002/43] | Lempert, Jost, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer.nat. Patentanwälte, Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Lichti, Dipl.-Phys. Dr. rer. nat. Jost Lempert, Dipl.-Ing. Hartmut Lasch, Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008351.5 | 12.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | DE2001119080 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10119080 | [2002/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1251357 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251357 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/02 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
G01R27/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/29] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Widerstandsmessung | [2002/43] | English: | Resistance measurement | [2002/43] | French: | Mesure de résistance | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 28.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000055954 ; | [A]JPH01100870 ; | [A]JPH10135412 ; | [A]JPH05209852 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000914), vol. 2000, no. 05, & JP2000055954 A 20000225 (GLORY LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890802), vol. 013, no. 343, Database accession no. (E - 796), & JP01100870 A 19890419 (YUASA BATTERY CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10135412 A 19980522 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931129), vol. 017, no. 643, Database accession no. (P - 1651), & JP05209852 A 19930820 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |