EP1253306 - Synchronizing mechanism of an internal combustion engine depending on the angle relationship of a rotating part [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2002/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Klaus Kärchergasse 10/19 1030 Wien / AT | 02 /
Hasslacher, Oliver Unterer Ezachweg 18 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
Wolf, Bodo Ahornweg 6 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2002/44] | Application number, filing date | 02008449.7 | 13.04.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | DE2001120799 | 27.04.2001 Original published format: DE 10120799 | [2002/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1253306 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1253306 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02B75/06, F02B75/00 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
F02D41/009 (EP,US);
F02D41/222 (EP,US);
H03M1/308 (EP,US);
F02D2041/227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/13] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Synchronisation einer Verbrennungskraftmaschine anhand der Winkellage eines rotierenden Teils | [2002/44] | English: | Synchronizing mechanism of an internal combustion engine depending on the angle relationship of a rotating part | [2002/44] | French: | Mécanisme de synchronisation d'un moteur à combustion interne dépendant d'un angle d'un élément rotatif | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/11] | 01.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 29.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4125677 (AUDI AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-6 * * abstract * * claims 1-5 *; | [XA]DE4141713 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 * * abstract * * claims 1-10 * [A] 2-8; | [A]DE19734595 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * claims 1-6 *; | [A]US6018233 (GLENNON TIMONTHY F [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-6 * * column A * * claims 1-22 * | by applicant | DE3307833 | DE4313331 |