EP1251325 - Heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosokawa, Toshiyuki The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 2-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
Hideno, Akira The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd., 2-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008598.1 | 16.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010119107 | 18.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001119107 | JP20020041564 | 19.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002041564 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251325 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251325 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [2002/43] | CPC: |
F28D9/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, SE [2005/16] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2002/43] | English: | Heat exchanger | [2002/43] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/43] | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS57142493 ; | [Y]US1444480 (PATCH JAMES W) [Y] 2,11,14,16 * page 1, line 73 - page 2, line 37; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US1472863 (BINGAY ROBERT V) [A] 1,2,9-11,14 * column W *; | [A]US2616530 (ALEXANDRE HOROWITZ) [A] 1,2,9-11,14 * column 3, line 28 - column 7, line 60; figures 1-16 *; | [XY]US2953110 (GEOFFREY ETHERIDGE) [X] 1,5-10 * column 2, line 53 - column 4, line 69; figures 1-3,10 * [Y] 2-4,11,12,14,16; | [X]US3719227 (JENSSEN S) [X] 1,7 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 66; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3829945 (KANZLER H, et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 53; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US4343355 (GOLOFF ALEXANDER, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 47 - column 5, line 56; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US4384611 (FUNG JAMES Y) [X] 7 * column 6, line 8 - column 10, line 68; figures 1-22 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821204), vol. 006, no. 246, Database accession no. (M - 176), & JP57142493 A 19820903 (NIPPON DENSO KK) [Y] 3,4,12 * abstract * [A] 15 |