EP1251000 - Metal-composite hose and a process for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKAI RUBBER INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi Aichi-ken, 485-8550 / JP | [2007/23] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states Tokai Rubber Industries, Ltd. 1, Higashi 3-chome Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katayama, Kazutaka 460-1 Muranaka Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485-0082 / JP | 02 /
Hibino, Motoshige TD-205 3-1 Higashi Komaki-shi, Aichi-ken, 485-0831 / JP | 03 /
Miyajima, Atsuo 10-12 Kamimaekawahara, Haguro Inuyama-shi, Aichi-ken, 484-0894 / JP | 04 /
Ito, Hiroaki 7-3-30 Fujiyamadai Kasugai-shi, Aichi-ken, 487-0035 / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH, Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008739.1 | 18.04.2002 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20010120528 | 19.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001120528 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251000 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251000 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | [2003/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1251000 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/08, B32B15/08, F16L11/04 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
F16L11/15 (EP,US);
B32B2597/00 (US);
Y10T428/1355 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/43] | B32B1/08, B32B15/08 | Designated contracting states | FR [2004/03] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Metallverbundschlauch und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [2002/43] | English: | Metal-composite hose and a process for manufacturing the same | [2002/43] | French: | Tuyau composite en métal et procédé de fabrication | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2003 | Examination requested [2003/40] | 21.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.12.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4781958 (GILBERT RONALD E [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 24 - line 38 ** figure 3 *; | [X]US4999903 (BUJES GEORGES [CH]) [X] 1,3-6 * column 3, line 24 - line 32 * * column 4, line 34 - line 55 * |