EP1253422 - Apparatus for inspecting gel covering seed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agritecno Yazaki Co., Ltd. 5-12 Tsuchiyama 6-chome Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Agritecno Yazaki Co., Ltd. 5-12 Tsuchiyama 6-chome Himeji-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maejima, Takamichi 5-12, Tsuchiyama 6-chome Himeji-shi, Hyogo / JP | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008848.0 | 19.04.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | JP20010124027 | 23.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001124027 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1253422 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/85, A01C1/06 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
G01N21/85 (EP,US);
G01N21/89 (KR);
A01C1/00 (KR);
A01C1/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2003/30] |
Former [2002/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Prüfen von Gel-umhüllten Samen | [2002/44] | English: | Apparatus for inspecting gel covering seed | [2002/44] | French: | Appareil d'inspection de graines enrobées de gel | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 12.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/07] | 18.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/38] | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH09225413 ; | [X]JPH09239330 ; | [X]JPH09122606 ; | [A]JPH08210984 ; | [A]JPH09108640 ; | [A]JPH09224421 ; | [A]US5421882 (KOUNO YASUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0956754 (AGRITECNO YAZAKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, line 6 - line 16 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09225413 A 19970902 (KUBOTA CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09239330 A 19970916 (KUBOTA CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09122606 A 19970513 (YAMAMOTO MFG CO LTD) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 1996, no. 12, & JP08210984 A 19960820 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 1997, no. 08, & JP09108640 A 19970428 (YAMAMOTO MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 1998, no. 01, & JP09224421 A 19970902 (YAZAKI CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * |