EP1252831 - Particles for tobacco products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/44] | For all designated states Givaudan SA 1214 Vernier / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De Roos, Kris Frans Tromplaan 77 3871 EM Hoevelaken / NL | 02 /
Ringgenberg, Rudolf Chapfstrasse 30 8625 Gossau/ZH / CH | 03 /
Riedo, Arthur Sprungstrasse 5 B 6314 Unterägeri / CH | 04 /
Kees, Honig 86, Verlengde Fortlaan 1412 EA Naarden / NL | [2002/44] | Representative(s) | Simmons, John Murray Givaudan Schweiz AG Global Patents Überlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2008/42] |
Former [2002/44] | Simmons, John Murray, Dr. Givaudan Duebendorf AG, Überlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 02008890.2 | 20.04.2002 | [2002/44] | Priority number, date | EP20010110292 | 26.04.2001 Original published format: EP 01110292 | [2002/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1252831 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1252831 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A24B15/28 | [2002/44] | CPC: |
A24B15/283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/44] | Title | German: | Partikel für Tabakwaren | [2002/44] | English: | Particles for tobacco products | [2002/44] | French: | Particules pour produits à base de tabac | [2002/44] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 25.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/16] | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3540456 (MCGLUMPHY JAMES H, et al); | [XD]GB1284151 (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [XD] 1,2,4-18 * page 3, line 98 - page 5, line 3; example -; claim - *; | [A]GB1349537 (IMP GROUP LTD); | [X]US5897897 (PORZIO MICHAEL A [US], et al) [X] 17,18 * column 6, line 36 - column 7, line 14 * * column 8, line 18 - line 29 * * column 14, line 37 - column 15, line 24 * * examples 9-11 * |