EP1357606 - Image sensor semiconductor package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.2005 [2005/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCIENTEK CORPORATION 4F, No. 22, Taiyuen Street ChuPei Hsinchu Shien / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | For all designated states SCIENTEK CORPORATION 4F, No. 22, Taiyuen Street ChuPei, Hsinchu Shien / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wang, Rong-Huei No. 5, Alley 40, Lane 116 Minghu Road Hsinchu / TW | 02 /
Chen, James 5F, No. 11, Lane 19, Sec. 1 Daan Road Taipei / TW | [2003/44] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Axel, et al Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Casalonga, Axel, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Paul-Heyse-Strasse 33 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008940.5 | 22.04.2002 | [2003/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1357606 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/02, H01L31/0203, H01L23/12 | [2003/44] | CPC: |
H01L23/055 (EP,US);
H01L27/14618 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85399 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/09701 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12044 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16151 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05599, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85399, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/44] | Title | German: | Gehäuse für einen Halbleiter-Bildsensor | [2003/44] | English: | Image sensor semiconductor package | [2003/44] | French: | Boîtier pour un capteur d'image à semi-conducteur | [2003/44] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 09.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS55159678 ; | [XY]US5264393 (TAMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,13-16 * column 4, line 10 - column 13, line 20; figures 1-7,10,12,13 * [Y] 7-12,17-22; | [YA]EP0751561 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12,22 * page 14, line 15 - page 17, line 24; figures 20,21,24 * [A] 1-11,13-21; | [A]US5851847 (YAMANAKA HIDEO [JP]) [A] 1-11,13-21* column 2, line 56 - column 6, line 2; figures 1A,1B *; | [Y]US6117193 (GLENN THOMAS P [US]) [Y] 7-11,17-21 * column 1, line 27 - column 1, line 36; figures 2-10 * * column 5, line 11 - column 11, line 67 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810304), vol. 005, no. 034, Database accession no. (E - 048), & JP55159678 A 19801211 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-11,13-21 * abstract * |