EP1255247 - Solvent composition and coating fluid for an optical recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.04.2007 [2007/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Okamoto, Hidekazu Asahi Glass Comp., 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02008943.9 | 22.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | JP20010129906 | 26.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001129906 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1255247 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1255247 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24, G11B7/26 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
G11B7/248 (EP,US);
G11B7/244 (EP,US);
G11B7/2467 (EP,US);
G11B7/2472 (EP,US);
G11B7/249 (EP,US);
G11B7/26 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/45] | G11B7/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/45] | Title | German: | Lösungszusammensetzung und Beschichtungsflüssigkeit für optisches Aufzeichnungsmedium | [2002/45] | English: | Solvent composition and coating fluid for an optical recording medium | [2002/45] | French: | Composition de solvant et liquide de revêtement pour medium d' enregistrement optique | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/35] | 01.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 05.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH02269106 ; | [X]JP2001055529 ; | [XA]JP2000326631 ; | [X]JPS53119134 ; | [XA]EP0996123 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * page 6, line 5 - line 12; claim 1 * [A] 3-10 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 50, Database accession no. 1990-372221, XP002223291 & JPH02269106 A 19901102 (KUREHA CHEM IND) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001055529 A 20010227 (MITSUBISHI) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2001, no. 10, Database accession no. 2001-085765, XP002223292 & JP2000326631 A 20001128 (MITSUBISHI) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-10 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 47, Database accession no. 1978-84648A, XP002223293 & JPS53119134 A 19781018 (PENTEL KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |