EP1258966 - Remote management of electrical pomps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pompes Salmson 3, rue Eugène et Armand Peugeot 92500 Rueil Malmaison / FR | [2002/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kernours, Michel Le Haut Ecottay 35370 Mondevert / FR | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Cabinet Hirsch 34, Rue de Bassano 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 02009138.5 | 24.04.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | FR20010005494 | 24.04.2001 Original published format: FR 0105494 | [2002/47] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1258966 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
H02J13/00007 (EP);
G05B2219/25188 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S20/00 (EP);
Y04S40/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/32] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Fernverwaltung von elektrischen Pumpen | [2002/47] | English: | Remote management of electrical pomps | [2002/47] | French: | Gestion à distance des pompes électriques | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/24] | 30.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/06] | 19.09.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4225534 (GNAUERT ROLF [DE]) [X] 1,9,14 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2798499 (PRIGENT O MEARA ERVEN [FR]) [X] 1,9,14* the whole document * |