EP1256288 - Electrical power outlet socket strip and its use as insertable drawer piece [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Modelec S.A. 30, Rue Saint-Maurice 2800 Delémont / CH | [2002/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulte, Siegfried Brüninghauser Strasse 9i 58515 Lüdenscheid / DE | 02 /
Flackus, Bernd Marienfelser Strasse 3 56357 Miehlen / DE | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Dörner, Lothar, et al Patentanwälte Dörner & Kötter PartG mbB Körnerstrasse 27 58095 Hagen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/10] | Dörner, Lothar, Dipl.-Ing., et al Stresemannstrasse 15 58095 Hagen / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | Hassler, Werner, Dr. Postfach 17 04 58467 Lüdenscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009177.3 | 25.04.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | DE2001122123 | 07.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10122123 | [2002/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1256288 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256288 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47B21/00 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
A47B21/06 (EP,US);
H01R13/447 (EP,US);
H01R25/006 (EP,US);
A47B2021/068 (EP,US);
H01R27/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/31] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Elektrische Anschlusssäule als Einschubteil | [2002/46] | English: | Electrical power outlet socket strip and its use as insertable drawer piece | [2002/46] | French: | Bloc multiprises à courant électrique utilisé en tant que tiroir escamotable | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 14.05.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.08.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 25.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.06.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.06.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5231562 (PIERCE LAWRENCE [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 333,4 *; | [A]US5351173 (BYRNE NORMAN R [US]) [A] 1* figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5429431 (OLSON OGDEN R [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 8,10 * |