EP1228894 - Protective layer transfer sheet and print [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.09.2006 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [2005/44] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Hitoshi, c/o Dai Nippon Printg. Co. Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1 chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 02 /
Takao, Shino, c/o Dai Nippon Printg. Co. Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1 chome, Shinjuki-Ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | 03 /
Matsufuji, Yuji, c/o Dai Nippon Printg. Co. Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kaga-cho 1 chome, Shinjuku-Ku Tokyo 162-01 / JP | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009268.0 | 26.08.1999 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | JP19980255998 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: JP 25599898 | JP19980260848 | 31.08.1998 Original published format: JP 26084898 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1228894 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228894 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
B41M5/38264 (EP);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24876 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/32] | Title | German: | Schutzschichtübertragungsfilm und Bilddruckmaterial | [2002/32] | English: | Protective layer transfer sheet and print | [2002/32] | French: | Film de transfert de couche protectrice et imprimé d'image | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 27.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99116712.3 / EP0982150 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4756963 (YAMAMOTO MAYUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 49 - line 68 * * column 4, line 3 - line 43 * * column 4, line 31; figures 1,3A,3B * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 5 * * example 4; claims 1,2,20 *; | [X]EP0677397 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4 * page 4, line 22 - line 26; claim 1 * * page 7, line 10 - line 35 * * page 8, line 39 - line 49 * * page 17, line 36 - line 50 * * page 18, line 10 - line 25 * * figures 1-4 *; | [PX]EP0917964 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-4 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 46 * * page 5, line 3 - page 8, line 3 ** figures 1-6; claims 1-9 * |