EP1259060 - Imaging device for generating a number of image points in a projection line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albrecht, Uwe Eckenförder Strasse 45m 24229 Schwedeneck / DE | 02 /
Beier, Bernard, Dr. Lustgartenstrasse 21 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 03 /
Ernst, Uwe Torwiesenstrasse 21 68163 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
Goos, Peter Stiller Winkel 5a 24248 Mönkeberg / DE | 05 /
Rupprecht, Andreas Am Schneeberg 12 69256 Mauer / DE | 06 /
Vosseler, Bernd Handschuhsheimer Landstrasse 36 69120 Heidelberg / DE | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/10] | Application number, filing date | 02009280.5 | 29.04.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | DE2001124215 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10124215 | [2002/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1259060 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1259060 | Date: | 18.05.2005 | [2005/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1259060 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/45, H04N1/053 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
B41J2/45 (EP,US);
B41C1/00 (EP,US);
B41J2/473 (EP,US);
H04N1/053 (EP,US);
B41C1/1075 (EP,US);
H04N1/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/20] | H04N1/053, B41J2/45 | ||
Former IPC [2002/47] | H04N1/053 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/47] | Title | German: | Bebilderungseinrichtung zur Erzeugung einer Anzahl von Bildpunkten in einer Projektionslinie | [2002/47] | English: | Imaging device for generating a number of image points in a projection line | [2002/47] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie pour générer un nombre de points d'image dans une ligne de projection | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 29.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2005 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | FI | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | AT | 29.04.2012 | IE | 29.04.2012 | LU | 29.04.2012 | BE | 30.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | GB | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | ES | 18.06.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
AT | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
AT | 29.04.2012 | ||
IE | 29.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
ES | 18.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
IE | 29.04.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
BE | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
FI | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | GR | 08.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56108185 ; | [A]US4571602 (DE SCHAMPHELAERE LUCIEN A [BE], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]DE9302494U (MAN ROLAND DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, 6050 OFFENBACH, DE) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-4 *; | [A]EP0684133 (PRESSTEK INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 6, line 45 - page 7, line 11 *; | [Y]DE19602307 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [Y] 1,3-6,9-12 *Zusammenfassung* * Kol 9, Zeilen 55-66*;; figure 7 *; | [Y]US6035076 (NAGASE YUKIO [JP]) [Y] 1,3-6,9-12 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US6201596 (SUGITA YUKIO [JP]) [Y] 1,3-6,9-12 * column 6, line 63 - column 9, line 50 * * column 15, lines 13-60; figures 4,5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811113), vol. 005, no. 113, Database accession no. (P - 089), & JP56108185 A 19810827 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2653539 | US5163368 | US5174205 | US5900981 | US6044096 |