EP1229672 - Optical data communication and location apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hill-Rom Services, Inc. 1069 State Route 46 East Batesville, IN 47006 / US | [2002/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shipley, Robert T. 6641 Glen Oaks Way Oakland, California 94611 / US | [2002/35] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [2002/32] | Frost, Alex John, et al Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 02009329.0 | 13.09.1995 | [2002/32] | Priority number, date | US19940309848 | 21.09.1994 Original published format: US 309848 | [2002/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1229672 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1229672 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | [2002/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1229672 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/21] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1229672 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/10 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
H04B10/1149 (EP,US);
G07C1/10 (EP,US);
G07C9/28 (EP,US);
G08B13/2462 (EP,US);
G08B13/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/32] | Title | German: | Optisches Datenübertragungs- und Ortungsgerät | [2002/32] | English: | Optical data communication and location apparatus | [2002/32] | French: | Appareil de transmission optique de données et de localisation | [2002/32] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 25.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95935098.4 / EP0782796 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 19.05.2004 | [2007/37] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3119876 (RUF KG WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1-6,9,11-13 * abstract *; | [AD]US5062151 (SHIPLEY ROBERT T [US]) [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 26 - line 35 * * column 2, line 14 - line 23 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 9 * * column 4, line 25 - line 51 *; | [A]US5345240 (FRAZIER LAWRENCE M [US]) [A] 1-3,7,9,10,14* abstract * |