EP1256368 - Method for sealing a silicon nitride filter and composition for sealing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states ASAHI GLASS COMPANY LTD. 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Naomichi, Miyakawa, Asahi Glass Company, Limited 1150, Hazawa-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009377.9 | 06.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010141931 | 11.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001141931 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256368 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256368 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/24, B01D39/20, C04B35/591, F01N3/022 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
B28B11/006 (EP,US);
B01D39/2075 (EP,US);
B01D46/2418 (EP,US);
C04B35/591 (EP,US);
C04B35/63416 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/46] | B01D46/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Abdichtung eines Siliziumnitridfilters und Zusammensetzung zur Abdichtung | [2002/46] | English: | Method for sealing a silicon nitride filter and composition for sealing | [2002/46] | French: | Procédé de scellement d'un filtre en nitrure de silicium et composition | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/21] | 16.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 15.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH08243329 ; | [X]JPS5895658 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [X] 10 * abstract *; | [A]EP0737801 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 58-6 * * page 5, lines 16-20 *; | [A]EP0816065 (IBIDEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1* page 3, lines 45-57; figure - *; | [A]US5853444 (MAIER HORST R [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, lines 4-18 *; | [A]EP0899003 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970131), vol. 1997, no. 01, & JP08243329 A 19960924 (DENKI KAGAKU KOGYO KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |