EP1255098 - Transfer fluid for pressure measurement and its application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WIKA Alexander Wiegand GmbH & Co.KG Alexander-Wiegand-Strasse 63911 Klingenberg/Main / DE | [2002/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Becker, Roman Trennfurter Strasse 56 63911 Klingenberg / DE | 02 /
Kalisch, Abrecht Hauptstrasse 63 63928 Eichenbühl / DE | 03 /
Pleyer, Jürgen Danziger Strasse 5 63811 Stockstadt / DE | 04 /
Petter, Peter Frühlingstrasse 6a 63920 Grossheubach / DE | [2002/46] |
Former [2002/45] | 01 /
Becker, Roman Trennfurter Strasse 56 63911 Klingenberg / DE | ||
02 /
Kalisch, Abrecht Danziger Strasse 4 63897 Miltenberg / DE | |||
03 /
Pleyer, Jürgen Danziger Strasse 5 63811 Stockstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Petter, Peter Frühlingstrasse 6a 63920 Grossheubach / DE | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/45] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009439.7 | 25.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | DE2001207260U | 27.04.2001 Original published format: DE 20107260 U | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1255098 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1255098 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
G01L19/0046 (EP,US);
G01L19/0645 (EP,US);
G01L7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2003/30] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Übertragungsflüssigkeit für die Druckmesstechnik und deren Anwendung | [2002/45] | English: | Transfer fluid for pressure measurement and its application | [2002/45] | French: | Fluide à transfert pour la mesure de pression et son application | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2002 | Examination requested [2003/06] | 15.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0794197 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1,7,16 * abstract * * page 2, line 3 - line 22 *; | [A]US5212989 (KODAMA SEIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,16 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 23; figure 1 * |