EP1234827 - Fungicidal heterocyclic aromatic amides and their compositions, methods of use and preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences, LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states Dow AgroSciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricks, Michael J. 8718 Gordonshire Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46278 / US | 02 /
Nader, Bassam S. 12025 Colbarn Drive Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | 03 /
Chenglin, Yao 14178 Esprit Drive Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 04 /
Dent, William H. III 7972 Austrian Pine Drive Indianapolis, Indiana 46268 / US | 05 /
Rogers, Richard B. 1957 Camargue Drive Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | 06 /
Miesel, John L. 8744 North Pennsylvania Street Indianapolis, Indiana 46240 / US | 07 /
Fitzpatrick, Gina M. 304 West Columbine Lane Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | 08 /
Niyaz, Noormohamed N. 14614 Bach Drive, Suite 525 Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | 09 /
Henry, Matthew J. 6356 Avalon Lane Indianapolis, Indiana 46220 / US | 10 /
Gajewski, Robert P. 1501 Friendship Avenue Indianapolis, Indiana 46217 / US | 11 /
Meyer, Kevin G. 100 Lexington Court Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | 12 /
Morrison, Irene M. 8224-206 Glenwillow Lane Indianapolis, Indiana 46278-2220 / US | 13 /
Adamski Butz, Jenifer 458 Prentiss Way Avon, Indiana 46123 / US | [2002/42] |
Former [2002/35] | 01 /
Ricks, Michael J. 8718 Gordonshire Drive Indianopolis, Indiana 46278 / US | ||
02 /
Nader, Bassam S. 12025 Colbarn Drive Fishers, Indiana 46038 / US | |||
03 /
Chenglin, Yao 14178 Esprit Drive Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | |||
04 /
Dent III, William H. 7972 Austrian Pine Drive Indianopolis, Indiana 46268 / US | |||
05 /
Rogers, Richard B. 1957 Camargue Drive Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | |||
06 /
Miesel, John L. 8744 North Pennsylvania Street Indianopolis, Indiana 46240 / US | |||
07 /
Fitzpatrick, Gina M. 304 West Columbine Lane Westfield, Indiana 46074 / US | |||
08 /
Noormohamed, M. Niyaz 14614 Bach Drive, Suite 525 Carmel, Indiana 46032 / US | |||
09 /
Henry, Matthew J. 6356 Avalon Lane Indianopolis, Indiana 46220 / US | |||
10 /
Gajewski, Robert P. 1501 Friendship Avenue Indianopolis, Indiana 46217 / US | |||
11 /
Meyer, Kevin G. 100 Lexington Court Zionsville, Indiana 46077 / US | |||
12 /
Morrison, Irene M. 8224-206 Glenwillow Lane Indianapolis, Indiana 46278-2220 / US | |||
13 /
Butz, Jenifer L. Adamski 458 Prentiss Way Avon, Indiana 46123 / US | Representative(s) | Weiss, Wolfgang, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | Weiss, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Chem. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009590.7 | 04.08.2000 | [2002/35] | Priority number, date | US19990149977P | 20.08.1999 Original published format: US 149977 P | US19990150248P | 23.08.1999 Original published format: US 150248 P | US20000620662 | 20.07.2000 Original published format: US 620662 | [2002/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1234827 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1234827 | Date: | 18.06.2003 | [2003/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D405/12, A01N43/40 | [2002/35] | CPC: |
C07D263/58 (EP);
A01N43/10 (EP);
A01N43/40 (EP);
A01N43/42 (EP);
A01N43/54 (EP);
A01N43/56 (EP);
A01N43/58 (EP);
A01N43/60 (EP);
A01N43/64 (EP);
A01N43/707 (EP);
A01N43/76 (EP);
A01N43/80 (EP);
A01N43/82 (EP);
A01N43/90 (EP);
A01N47/06 (EP);
A01N47/22 (EP);
A01N53/00 (EP);
A01N55/00 (EP);
C07D213/81 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D237/24 (EP);
C07D239/34 (EP);
C07D241/24 (EP);
C07D253/075 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/35] | Title | German: | Fungizide, heterozyklische, aromatische Amide, deren Zusammensetzungen sowie Verfahren zu deren Anwendung und Herstellung | [2002/35] | English: | Fungicidal heterocyclic aromatic amides and their compositions, methods of use and preparation | [2002/35] | French: | Amides aromatiques, hétérocycliques fongicides et leurs compositions ainsi que mode d'emploi et préparation | [2002/35] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 01.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00952599.9 / EP1204643 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9940081 (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2; | EP1054011 [ ] (MEIJI SEIKA KAISHA [JP]) [ ] * page 3; examples UK-2A,UK-2B,UK-2C,UK-2D * * example 18; table 1 ** table 3 *; | [EL]WO0105769 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [EL] 1,2 * page 112; example 382 * * table 2 * * L: Priority *; | [A] - HANAFI M ET AL, "UK-2A, B, C AND D, NOVE ANTIFUNGAL ANTIBIOTICS FROM STREPTOMYCES SP. 517-02 H. STRUCTURAL ELUCIDATION", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, JAPAN ANTIBIOTICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION. TOKYO, JP, (19961201), vol. 49, no. 12, ISSN 0021-8820, pages 1226 - 1231, XP002914770 [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |