EP1255072 - Water-tight tubular lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2007 [2007/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R. Stahl Schaltgeräte GmbH Am Bahnhof 30 74638 Waldenburg / DE | [2002/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pilz, Dieter Obere Gartenstrasse 25 74632 Neuenstein / DE | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Rüger Abel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Patentanwälte Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Postfach 10 04 61 73704 Esslingen a.N. / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009654.1 | 29.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | DE20011021613 | 04.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10121613 | [2002/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1255072 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1255072 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F21V31/00, F21V25/12 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
F21V25/12 (EP);
F21V31/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2006/36] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Wasserdichte rohrförmige Leuchte | [2002/45] | English: | Water-tight tubular lamp | [2002/45] | French: | Luminaire tubulaire et étanche à l'eau | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/25] | 22.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.11.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE867721 (LICENTIA PATENT-VERWALTUNGS-G.M.B.H) [X] 1-13,16,17,21-25,27 * the whole document * [Y] 18-20,28; | [Y]FR1299027 (LE PROJECTEUR STANDARD) [Y] 18-20,28 * page 1, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 2, column 1, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB1533999 (OBERWEIMAR ELEKTROINSTALLATION) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE853773 (ADOLF SCHUCH K.-G) [DA] 1-28 * page 2, line 109 - page 3, line 106; figures 1-4 * |