EP1255042 - Inlet valve for swash plate compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome, Nakano-ku Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirose, Ryuichi Calsonic Kansei Corp., 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | 02 /
Nadamoto, Hiroyasu Calsonic Kansei Corp., 24-15, Minamidai 5-chome Nakano-ku, Tokyo 164-8602 / JP | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009763.0 | 30.04.2002 | [2002/45] | Priority number, date | JP20010134482 | 01.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001134482 | [2002/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1255042 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1255042 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | [2007/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/10, F04B39/10 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
F04B39/108 (EP,US);
F04B39/10 (KR);
F16K15/1402 (US);
F16K15/16 (US);
F16K15/162 (US);
Y10T137/7839 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2002/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Einlassventil für einen Taumelscheibenverdichter | [2002/45] | English: | Inlet valve for swash plate compressor | [2002/45] | French: | Vanne d'admission pour compresseur à plateau en biais | [2002/45] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 03.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2725183 (LARS HANSON) [A] 1-9,15-17 * figure 4 * * column 1, line 70 - column 2, line 4 *; | [A]JPS6341683 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1,17* abstract *; | [X]US4764091 (IKEDA HAYATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-9,15-17 * abstract * * column 1, lines 23-28 * * column 4, lines 34-41 * * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 18 * * column 8, lines 26-34 *; | [A]US5328338 (HIRANO YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 2, line 61 - column 3, line 8 * * column 8, lines 3-10 * * column 8, lines 31-34 *; | [A]JPH09228951 (MATSUSHITA REFRIGERATION) [A] 1,17 * abstract *; | [X]EP1054157 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1-9,15-17 * figure - * * sentences 29-31, paragraph 2 * * sentences 22-35, paragraph 18 * * sentences 35-45, paragraph 26 * * column 10, line 46 - column 11, line 2 * | by applicant | JPH09280168 |