EP1258788 - Incremental distributed actuation for large assemblies of implementation units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester, New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fromherz, Markus P.J. 3480 Thomas Drive Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 02 /
Jackson, Warren B. 160 Castenada Avenue San Francisco, California 94116-1407 / US | [2002/47] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/47] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009779.6 | 30.04.2002 | [2002/47] | Priority number, date | US20010845210 | 01.05.2001 Original published format: US 845210 | [2002/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1258788 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1258788 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/02 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
G05B13/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2004/29] |
Former [2002/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schrittweise arbeitender verteilter Antrieb für grosse Baugruppen von Betriebseinheiten | [2002/47] | English: | Incremental distributed actuation for large assemblies of implementation units | [2002/47] | French: | Fonctionnement progressif distribué de grands ensembles d'unités d'actionneurs | [2002/47] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/03] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 03.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0658997 (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]US6039316 (JACKSON WARREN B [US], et al); | [A]WO0126330 (SENSORIA CORP [US], et al) |