EP1266780 - Sheet as semi-manufactured blank for a side impact protection bar and side impact protection bar for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | [2003/38] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Benteler Automobiltechnik GmbH & Co. KG Residenzstrasse 1 33104 Paderborn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehringhoff, Ludger Tulpenweg 34 33106 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
Klasfauseweh, Dr. Udo Spexarder Postweg 24 33334 Gütersloh / DE | 03 /
Knaup, Hans-Jürgen Adolf Kolping Strasse 194 33175 Bad Lippspringe / DE | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Bockermann, Rolf Bockermann, Ksoll, Griepenstroh, Patentanwälte, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Bockermann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bockermann, Ksoll, Griepenstroh, Patentanwälte, Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 02009920.6 | 03.05.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | DE2001128198 | 11.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10128198 | [2002/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266780 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266780 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60J5/04 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
B60J5/0444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Title | German: | Platine als Halbzeug für einen Seitenaufprallträger und Seitenaufprallträger für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2002/51] | English: | Sheet as semi-manufactured blank for a side impact protection bar and side impact protection bar for a vehicle | [2002/51] | French: | Tôle comme produit semi-fabriqué pour une barre de protection latéral et barre de protection latéral pour véhicule | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 24.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.10.2003 | FI | 29.10.2003 | FR | 29.10.2003 | GB | 29.10.2003 | IE | 29.10.2003 | IT | 29.10.2003 | NL | 29.10.2003 | TR | 29.10.2003 | DK | 29.01.2004 | GR | 29.01.2004 | SE | 29.01.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | AT | 03.05.2004 | LU | 03.05.2004 | BE | 31.05.2004 | MC | 31.05.2004 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/37] | CY | 29.10.2003 | |
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
IT | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
TR | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
AT | 03.05.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CY | 29.10.2003 | |
FI | 29.10.2003 | ||
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
TR | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
AT | 03.05.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
TR | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
AT | 03.05.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
FR | 29.10.2003 | ||
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
AT | 03.05.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
AT | 03.05.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
BE | 31.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
LU | 03.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
MC | 31.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
GB | 29.10.2003 | ||
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
DK | 29.01.2004 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
IE | 29.10.2003 | ||
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
NL | 29.10.2003 | ||
GR | 29.01.2004 | ||
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 29.10.2003 | |
SE | 29.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 29.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO9407709 (PLANNJA HARDTECH AB [SE], et al) [XD] 1,2,4 * page 1, line 5 - line 14 * * page 5, line 10 - page 7, line 13 * * figures 1,4 *; | [XD]DE29620079U (BENTELER WERKE AG [DE]) [XD] 1-5 * page 2, line 25 - line 31 * * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 15 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0015453 (COSMA INT INC [CA]) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 9 - line 15 * * page 4, line 21 - page 5, line 16 ** figures 2-5 * |