EP1361771 - Method and radio communication system for transmission of user information as a service to multiple user terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2004 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2005 [2005/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Jürgen Herbstgasse 15 86504 Merching / DE | 02 /
Schniedenharn, Joerg An der Havelspitze 23 13587 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Wehmeier, Lars Eichendorfstrasse 17 10115 Berlin / DE | [2003/46] | Application number, filing date | 02010088.9 | 06.05.2002 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361771 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/38, G07F7/10 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
H04L63/10 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (US);
H04W8/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | [2004/32] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Funkkommunikationssystem zur Übertragung von Nutzinformationen als Dienst an mehrere Teilnehmerstationen | [2003/46] | English: | Method and radio communication system for transmission of user information as a service to multiple user terminals | [2003/46] | French: | Méthode et système de communication par radio pour la transmission d'information utile comme service à plusieurs terminaux d'utilisateur | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/06] | 03.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.06.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.06.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL1007409C (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [A] 1-11* page 1, lines 16-25 *; | [A]WO9901848 (SONERA OY [FI], et al) [A] 2 * page 3, lines 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1164804 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [Y] 1-11 * column 3, lines 35-41 * * column 7, lines 6-12 * * column 8, lines 29-41 *; | [Y]US6370380 (NOREFORS ARNE [SE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 21 * |